AL HJR5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-21 - Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wounded Warriors and Disabled Veterans Day, recognized
Title
Wounded Warriors and Disabled Veterans Day, recognized
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Alan Boothe [R] | Rep. Harry Bridges [R] |
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] | Rep. Mac Buttram [R] | Sen. Donnie Chesteen [R] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] |
Rep. Allen Farley [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. Victor Gaston [R] |
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Ken Johnson [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] |
Rep. Wes Long [R] | Rep. Barry Mask [R] | Sen. Jim McClendon [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. John Merrill [R] | Rep. Mike Millican [R] | Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] |
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] | Rep. William Roberts [R] | Sen. David Sessions [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] | Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] | Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
Rep. Jack Williams [R] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Delivered to Governor at 5:23 p. m. on February 21, 2012. | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned Act No. 2012-14 on 02/28/2012. | |
2012-02-21 | Signature Requested | |
2012-02-21 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-02-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-02-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-02-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-09 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-02-09 | PERMISSION GRANTED | |
2012-02-09 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |