AL SB115 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend Section 40-9-12, Code of Alabama 1975, regarding tax exemptions, to change the name of the National Foundation to reflect its current name, the March of Dimes Inc.
Title
To amend Section 40-9-12, Code of Alabama 1975, regarding tax exemptions, to change the name of the National Foundation to reflect its current name, the March of Dimes Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |