AL SB116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Judiciary first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Attorneys, indigent defense fees, waiver of maximum allowed fee by trial court or Director in Indigent Defense Services, Sec. 15-12-21 am'd.
Title
Attorneys, indigent defense fees, waiver of maximum allowed fee by trial court or Director in Indigent Defense Services, Sec. 15-12-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 846 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Whatley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Judiciary Substitute Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |