AL SB14 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-83.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-83.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education, teachers, time increased for public K-12 teachers to give notice of terminating employment from 5 to 30 days, requirement for postsecondary education employees deleted, Sec. 16-24C-11 am'd.
Title
Education, teachers, time increased for public K-12 teachers to give notice of terminating employment from 5 to 30 days, requirement for postsecondary education employees deleted, Sec. 16-24C-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Brown motion Local Application (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Brown motion Local Application (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-83. |
2018-02-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 232 |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 67 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |