AL SB15 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Assigned Act No. 2010-255 on 03/30/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Assigned Act No. 2010-255 on 03/30/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cullman Co., occupational tax, levy prohibited, const. amend.
Title
Cullman Co., occupational tax, levy prohibited, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Zeb Little [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Assigned Act No. 2010-255 on 03/30/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 23, 2010 at 4:02 p.m. on March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-23 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-23 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-23 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 642 | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 393 | |
2010-02-25 | Little (Z) motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 392 | |
2010-02-25 | Little (Z) Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Little (Z) requested unanimous consent to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-02-17 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-16 | Bedford requested unanimous consent to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted. | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Little (Z) motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-02-04 | Little (Z) motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote . | |
2010-02-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 | |
2010-01-14 | Reported from Local Legislation No. 1 as Favorable | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |