AL SB175 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cockfighting, penalties increased, presence at cockfights, penalties, confiscation procedures, fines, terms defined, reporting procedures, Secs. 13A-12-4.1, 13A-12-4.2 added; Sec. 13A-12-4 am'd.
Title
Cockfighting, penalties increased, presence at cockfights, penalties, confiscation procedures, fines, terms defined, reporting procedures, Secs. 13A-12-4.1, 13A-12-4.2 added; Sec. 13A-12-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-04-26 | Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-26 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 808 | |
2012-04-26 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |