AL SB195 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Agency, eligibility verification mechanisms required, identity verification, use of third-party vendors auth., reporting of fraud
Title
Medicaid Agency, eligibility verification mechanisms required, identity verification, use of third-party vendors auth., reporting of fraud
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 829 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 828 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |