AL SB204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-498.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-498.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative procedures, terminology updated, business impact analysis further specified when agency is required to prepare, revise the name of the Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review to Joint Committee on Administrative Rule Review, Secs. 41-22-2, 41-22-3, 41-22-5, 41-22-5.1, 41-22-5.2, 41-22-6, 41-22-7, 41-22-8, 41-22-22, 41-22-22.1, 41-22-23, 41-22-27 am'd.
Title
Administrative procedures, terminology updated, business impact analysis further specified when agency is required to prepare, revise the name of the Joint Committee on Administrative Regulation Review to Joint Committee on Administrative Rule Review, Secs. 41-22-2, 41-22-3, 41-22-5, 41-22-5.1, 41-22-5.2, 41-22-6, 41-22-7, 41-22-8, 41-22-22, 41-22-22.1, 41-22-23, 41-22-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-498. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1135 |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 365 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |