AL SB215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 3 municipality organized under Act 618, 1973 Regular Session (Montgomery), airport authority, board members appointment by mayor, confirmed by the city council
Title
Class 3 municipality organized under Act 618, 1973 Regular Session (Montgomery), airport authority, board members appointment by mayor, confirmed by the city council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 696 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-05-02 | House | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to House Montgomery County Legislation |
2024-04-23 | House | Pending House County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 696 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |