AL SB24 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses; falsely reporting; penalties revised; restitution required
Title
Crimes and offenses; falsely reporting; penalties revised; restitution required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Prefiled |