AL SB243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Definition of Moral Turpitude Act, established, crimes which disqualify citizens from voting provided, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added
Title
Definition of Moral Turpitude Act, established, crimes which disqualify citizens from voting provided, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 721 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 720 | |
2011-05-25 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Sanders amendment tabled | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-05 | Sanders Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |