AL SB245 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Crime Victims Compensation Commission; restitution further provided for; members compensation further provided for
Title
Alabama Crime Victims Compensation Commission; restitution further provided for; members compensation further provided for
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |