AL SB261 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer lawsuit lenders, licensing, certain provisions of Mini Code apply to loans and extension of credit, Alabama Consumer Lawsuit Lending Act
Title
Consumer lawsuit lenders, licensing, certain provisions of Mini Code apply to loans and extension of credit, Alabama Consumer Lawsuit Lending Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Whatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |