AL SB269 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Semmes, corporate limits altered
Title
Semmes, corporate limits altered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1117 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 747 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 747 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1117 |
2024-05-07 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-25 | House | Pending House Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 747 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation |