AL SB274 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elderly, elder abuse protection orders, authorized, elder abuse defined, Sec. 15-10-3 am'd.
Title
Elderly, elder abuse protection orders, authorized, elder abuse defined, Sec. 15-10-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt JUDY AMENDMENT (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt JUDY AMENDMENT (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-284. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-09 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 935 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 842 |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Adopt Judiciary Amendment adopted Roll Call 841 |
2017-05-04 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 694 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |