AL SB284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2014-135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2014-135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recycling, biodegradable plastic containers to meet standards for compostable products and be clearly labeled to prevent contamination of recyclable plastic containers
Title
Recycling, biodegradable plastic containers to meet standards for compostable products and be clearly labeled to prevent contamination of recyclable plastic containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-135. |
2014-02-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 473 |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pittman Motion to Reconsider Lost Voice Vote |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources |