AL SB288 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Mobile County; to provide further for the sheriff's compensation by an annual expense allowance to expire at the end of the current term of office; to add an amount equal to the temporary expense allowance to the sheriff's annual salary commencing with the next term of office.
Title
Relating to Mobile County; to provide further for the sheriff's compensation by an annual expense allowance to expire at the end of the current term of office; to add an amount equal to the temporary expense allowance to the sheriff's annual salary commencing with the next term of office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported Favorably from House Mobile County Legislation |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred to Committee to House Mobile County Legislation |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-09 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Mobile County Legislation |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |