AL SB294 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public preK-12 schools, campus chaplains, public schools authorized to hire or accept as volunteers, local boards of education and governing bodies required to vote on whether to allow, limitations provided
Title
Public preK-12 schools, campus chaplains, public schools authorized to hire or accept as volunteers, local boards of education and governing bodies required to vote on whether to allow, limitations provided
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 541 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Education Policy HFZV883-1 |
2024-05-01 | House | Education Policy 1st Amendment J4HINYY-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 541 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |