AL SB325 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Coffee County; to amend Section 45-16-62, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the appointment of a chief deputy coroner and a deputy coroner, to provide for compensation for the chief deputy coroner and deputy coroner, and to repeal Section 45-16-61, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the appointment of a deputy coroner.
Title
Relating to Coffee County; to amend Section 45-16-62, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the appointment of a chief deputy coroner and a deputy coroner, to provide for compensation for the chief deputy coroner and deputy coroner, and to repeal Section 45-16-61, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the appointment of a deputy coroner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-31 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-31 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-31 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Committee to House Local Legislation |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-23 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |