AL SB328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Storage facilities, self-service, Self-Service Storage Facilities Act, created, definitions, operator's liens, authorized, Secs. 8-15-40 to 8-15-49, inclusive, added; Secs. 8-15-30 to 8-15-38, inclusive, repealed
Title
Storage facilities, self-service, Self-Service Storage Facilities Act, created, definitions, operator's liens, authorized, Secs. 8-15-40 to 8-15-49, inclusive, added; Secs. 8-15-30 to 8-15-38, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-29 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government |
2019-05-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | House | Rereferred from C&SB to SG |
2019-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 939 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 938 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |