AL SB342 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural property, museums and other institutions authorized to claim certain abandoned property under certain conditions, procedures, notice, exceptions
Title
Cultural property, museums and other institutions authorized to claim certain abandoned property under certain conditions, procedures, notice, exceptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment |
2017-05-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 982 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 981 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Waggoner Amendment Offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 980 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |