AL SB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2017-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2017-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lowndes Co., county board of education, members, compensation
Title
Lowndes Co., county board of education, members, compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-435. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 950 |
2017-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 856 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |