AL SB402 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Insurance Program, Care Assurance System for the Aging and Homebound authorized to participate, Sec. 11-91A-2 am'd.
Title
Local Government Insurance Program, Care Assurance System for the Aging and Homebound authorized to participate, Sec. 11-91A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Insurance |
2017-05-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 985 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |