AL SB425 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-500.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-500.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Medical Examiners, physicians, Buprenorphine, guidelines for prescribing, review committee established to aid in rule drafting
Title
Board of Medical Examiners, physicians, Buprenorphine, guidelines for prescribing, review committee established to aid in rule drafting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-500. |
2019-05-31 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1282 |
2019-05-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1237 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |