AL SB71 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to counties and municipalities; to provide alternative virtual or electronic methods for the posting of certain public notices required by law.
Title
Relating to counties and municipalities; to provide alternative virtual or electronic methods for the posting of certain public notices required by law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt RS1CMM-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Adopt INREWW-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Adopt 76PNE2-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt RS1CMM-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Adopt INREWW-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Adopt 76PNE2-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt RS1CMM-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government |
2023-04-19 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House County and Municipal Government RS1CMM-1 |
2023-04-14 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House County and Municipal Government D9P7TN-1 |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Adopt INREWW-1 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Adopt 76PNE2-1 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Banking and Insurance 76PNE2-1 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |