AL SB91 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Agriculture, to amend Sections 2-8-126, 2-8-128, 2-8-131, 2-8-133, 2-8-134, 2-8-135, and 2-8-323, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the requirements for giving notice of a referendum on an assessment to be used to promote peanuts specifically as well as other nuts, bulbs, fruits, and vegetables; to revise the time an assessment on the sale of nuts, bulbs, fruits, or vegetables is effective between referendums; to revise the percentage the Commissioner of Agriculture and Industries may deduct from the sum of the assessment on nuts, bulbs, fruit, and vegetables; to revise the length of time between audits of an organization certified to conduct a referendum regarding an assessment on the sale of sheep and goats; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Title
Relating to Agriculture, to amend Sections 2-8-126, 2-8-128, 2-8-131, 2-8-133, 2-8-134, 2-8-135, and 2-8-323, Code of Alabama 1975, to revise the requirements for giving notice of a referendum on an assessment to be used to promote peanuts specifically as well as other nuts, bulbs, fruits, and vegetables; to revise the time an assessment on the sale of nuts, bulbs, fruits, or vegetables is effective between referendums; to revise the percentage the Commissioner of Agriculture and Industries may deduct from the sum of the assessment on nuts, bulbs, fruit, and vegetables; to revise the length of time between audits of an organization certified to conduct a referendum regarding an assessment on the sale of sheep and goats; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-04-19 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-18 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Agriculture and Forestry |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee to House Agriculture and Forestry |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |