AL SB97 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Public Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Public Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, accidents, when no apparent physical injury driver authorized to move motor vehicle from roadway, authorize Department of Transportation employees to assist in moving disabled vehicle, immunity, Sec. 32-10-1 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, accidents, when no apparent physical injury driver authorized to move motor vehicle from roadway, authorize Department of Transportation employees to assist in moving disabled vehicle, immunity, Sec. 32-10-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 amendment |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1053 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1052 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Acted on by Transportation and Energy as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation & Energy |