AR HB1001 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Integrate And Incorporate The Provisions Of Acts 2017, Nos. 207, 312, And 1108 Into Arkansas Constitution, Article 19, § 30; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Integrate And Incorporate The Provisions Of Acts 2017, Nos. 207, 312, And 1108 Into Arkansas Constitution, Article 19, § 30; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Notification that HB1001 is now Act 2 |
2017-05-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-05-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-05-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-05-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-05-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-05-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-05-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed |