AR SB1 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Notification that SB1 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-second General Assembly Appropriation For The 2019 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Expenses For The Arkansas Senate Of The Ninety-second General Assembly Appropriation For The 2019 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Notification that SB1 is now Act 3 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-01-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-01-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-01-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2019-01-17 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |