AR SB122 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Notification that SB122 is now Act 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Notification that SB122 is now Act 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Title
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Notification that SB122 is now Act 260 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2018-03-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Filed |