AR SB378 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize Public Adjusting By Providing Insurance Consumers The Right To Employ Their Own Insurance Adjuster.
Title
To Authorize Public Adjusting By Providing Insurance Consumers The Right To Employ Their Own Insurance Adjuster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read third time and failed to pass. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate EXPUNGED | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read third time and failed to pass. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-03-21 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Filed |