AR SB71 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Notification that SB71 is now Act 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Notification that SB71 is now Act 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Education - Arkansas School For The Blind And Arkansas School For The Deaf Reappropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Education - Arkansas School For The Blind And Arkansas School For The Deaf Reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB71 is now Act 111 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2024-04-23 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2024-04-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-23 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2024-04-23 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2024-04-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2024-04-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Filed |