AR SB86 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB86 is now Act 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB86 is now Act 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Department Of Health To Study And Report On The Status Of Naturopathic Physicians In Arkansas And Other States.
Title
To Require The Department Of Health To Study And Report On The Status Of Naturopathic Physicians In Arkansas And Other States.
Sponsors
Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB86 is now Act 670 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed |