AZ HB2025 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-14 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-14 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential lease community; water; requirements
Title
Residential lease community; water; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Applicability
Building Permits
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Real Estate
Requirements
Residential Lease Communities
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Water
Waters - Title 45
Building Permits
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Counties - Title 11
Real Estate
Requirements
Residential Lease Communities
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Water
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 324 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 576 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3772 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3774 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 469 | New Code | See Bill Text |