AZ HB2078 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cancer treatment medications; cost-sharing
Title
Cancer treatment medications; cost-sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 255 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | House final reading , voting: (53-0-7-0) |
2014-04-23 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |