AZ HB2236 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Military pensions; increase; tax subtraction
Title
Military pensions; increase; tax subtraction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-9-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-05 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |