AZ HB2254 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1057
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lyme; vector-borne diseases; treatment.
Title
Lyme; vector-borne diseases; treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Subjects
Health Care Professionals
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Ryan Montgomery Lyme Disease Treatment Act
Vector-borne Diseases
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Ryan Montgomery Lyme Disease Treatment Act
Vector-borne Diseases