AZ SB1057 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2254
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lyme; tick-borne diseases; treatment
Title
Lyme; tick-borne diseases; treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-24 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-02-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-31-1-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
HB2254 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Health Care Professionals
Lyme
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Ryan Montgomery Lyme Disease Treatment Act
Tick-borne Diseases
Treatment
Vector-borne Diseases
Lyme
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Ryan Montgomery Lyme Disease Treatment Act
Tick-borne Diseases
Treatment
Vector-borne Diseases