AZ HB2289 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; legal opinions; schools
Title
Technical correction; legal opinions; schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-6-2-1-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |