AZ HB2291 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probation standards; annual report; counties
Title
Probation standards; annual report; counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |