AZ HB2303 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting centers; polling places
Title
Voting centers; polling places
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] |
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Rep. James Weiers [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (59-1-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 1:10 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (55-5-0-0) | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-03 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |