AZ HB2306 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate ELEC Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Senate ELEC Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; aggregate committee limits
Title
Campaign finance; aggregate committee limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Held |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |