AZ HB2306 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fingerprint clearance cards; periodic checks
Title
Fingerprint clearance cards; periodic checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Chapter 56 | |
2014-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-15 | House | House final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-04-15 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |