AZ HB2308 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility; defensive driving schools
Title
Eligibility; defensive driving schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Chapter 281 | |
2015-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-31 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | House | House final reading , voting: (35-25-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House TI Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |