AZ HB2314 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lake improvement; boating safety; funds.
Title
Lake improvement; boating safety; funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-04-12 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-1-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | House third reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House AW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |