AZ HB2436 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State contracts; foreign adversary; prohibition
Title
State contracts; foreign adversary; prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Carter that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2436 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Carter that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), HB2436 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-28 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-2-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Covered Company
Foreign Adversaries
Procurement Code
Prohibition
Protection Procurement Act
Short Title
State Contracts
State Government - Title 41
Foreign Adversaries
Procurement Code
Prohibition
Protection Procurement Act
Short Title
State Contracts
State Government - Title 41