AZ HB2445 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Referred to Senate WE Committee
Pending: Senate Water and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Referred to Senate WE Committee
Pending: Senate Water and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Desalinization; study committee
Title
Desalinization; study committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate WE Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WE Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |