AZ HB2450 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State highways; technical correction
Title
State highways; technical correction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-20 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-1-0-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Consent Calendar April 04, 2011 @ 1:05 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |