AZ HB2455 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unclaimed property; firearms; disposition
Title
Unclaimed property; firearms; disposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-25 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |