AZ HB2581 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
STOs; credits; administration
Title
STOs; credits; administration
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] |
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Rep. David Stevens [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-7-2-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | House third reading , voting: (39-21-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-07 | House read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-03 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-03 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced in House and read first time |